skip to content

Hope, Andrew J

CPSO#: 87585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wisconsin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 5 - 606
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2124 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hope ( CPSO# 87585 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
5-606
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:18 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW J HOPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010