THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:49:30 PM
Hope, Andrew J
CPSO#:
87585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Wisconsin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room 5 - 606
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2124
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:18 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW J HOPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |