skip to content

Holmes, John Melburn Douglas

CPSO#: 21920

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Dec 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 1999

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 1999
Summary:

 On November 15, 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Holmes guilty of professional misconduct 
 and ordered that his certificate of registration be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 1999