THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:08:26 AM
Holmes, John Melburn Douglas
CPSO#:
21920
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
19 Dec 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1969 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 19 Dec 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 1999
Summary:
On November 15, 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Holmes guilty of professional misconduct and ordered that his certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 1999