skip to content

Hirschfield, Gideon Morris

CPSO#: 87751

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Centre for Liver Disease
Rm 226, TGH 9EN - 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4548
Fax: (416) 340-3583 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gideon Hirschfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:03 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2018
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Gideon Morris Hirschfield may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Gastroenterology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Hirschfield holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate   of   registration   automatically  expires  when  Dr.
                  Hirschfield no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.