THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:35:35 AM
Hirschfield, Gideon Morris
CPSO#:
87751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Centre for Liver Disease
Rm 226, TGH 9EN - 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4548
Fax: (416) 340-3583
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gideon Hirschfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:03 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2018 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Nov 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Nov 2020 |
|
Active |