skip to content

Hiraki, George Yoshinori

CPSO#: 14294

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 May 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: George Y. Hiraki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hiraki ( CPSO# 14294 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Yoshinori Hiraki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2019:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about my standard of practice in general surgery, Dr. Hiraki underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in general surgery. In the face of this reassessment report, Dr. Hiraki resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)