THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:53:05 AM
Hiraki, George Yoshinori
CPSO#:
14294
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jul 1953
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: George Y. Hiraki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 May 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Yoshinori Hiraki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2019:
Following a public complaint that raised concerns about my standard of practice in general surgery, Dr. Hiraki underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in general surgery. In the face of this reassessment report, Dr. Hiraki resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)