skip to content

Hilal, Ali Abbas Mahmoud

CPSO#: 85523

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 175
2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: 5199460230
Fax: 5199625937 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Hilal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hilal ( CPSO# 85523 )

Business Address:
129 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 946-0230

Business Address:
Suite 175
2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: 5199460230

Business Address:
Suite 175
2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: 5199460230

Business Address:
Suite 175- 2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: 5199460230

Business Address:
Suite 175
2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: 5199460230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:31 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI ABBAS MAHMOUD HILAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 20 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010