THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:11:00 AM
Hilal, Ali Abbas Mahmoud
CPSO#:
85523
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 175
2224, Walker Road
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: 5199460230
Fax: 5199625937
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:31 Jul 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI ABBAS MAHMOUD HILAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 20 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2010 |