skip to content

Hertzman, Natalie W M

CPSO#: 86545

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Leung, Natalie W M (used until: 26 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
485 Windermere Road
PO Box 1449, Station B
London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 5M2
Phone: 519-438-2102
Fax: (519) 488-0687 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hertzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hertzman ( CPSO# 83255 )
Dr. N. Hertzman ( CPSO# 86545 )

Business Address:
485 Windermere Road
P O Box 1449 Station B
London ON  N6A 5M2
Phone Number: (519) 438-2012

Business Address:
105-262 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1T8
Phone Number: (888) 495-5898

Business Address:
790 Maitland St
London ON  N5Y 2W5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALIE W M HERTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009