skip to content

Hertzman, Daniel

CPSO#: 83255

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Maitland St
London ON  N5Y 2W5
Phone: 888-495-5898
Fax: 855-745-5878 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hertzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hertzman ( CPSO# 83255 )
Dr. N. Hertzman ( CPSO# 86545 )

Business Address:
105-262 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1T8
Phone Number: (888) 495-5898

Business Address:
485 Windermere Road
P O Box 1449 Station B
London ON  N6A 5M2
Phone Number: (519) 438-2012

Business Address:
790 Maitland St
London ON  N5Y 2W5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL HERTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010