skip to content

Hernandez Murcia, Lizeth Alexandra

CPSO#: 86400

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: 4166545437
Fax: 6476892371 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

310-1193 Fischer Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON  N2R 0H3
Canada
Phone: 5195931004
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective:01 Nov 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019 Active
 Dr.  Lizeth  Alexandra  Hernandez Murcia may practise medicine independently in
            pediatrics.