THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:55:23 AM
Hernandez Murcia, Lizeth Alexandra
CPSO#:
86400
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-1435 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7T5
Phone: 9058899950
Fax: 9058478435
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Nov 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2019 |
|
Active |