skip to content

Hernandez Alejandro, Roberto

CPSO#: 85279

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hernandez-Alejandro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre University Hospital Health Records Department Tel: 519-663-5841
Date Received: 17 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:02 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Solid Organ Transplantation

Western University, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Jan 2009
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016