THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:11:27 PM
Hernandez Alejandro, Roberto
CPSO#:
85279
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hernandez-Alejandro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital Health Records Department
Tel: 519-663-5841
Date Received: 17 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:02 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Jan 2009
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2016 |