skip to content

Hassell, Christopher Hilton

CPSO#: 30937

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 27 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Christopher Hilton Hassell’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hassell failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and is incompetent in his care of patients. It is further alleged that Dr. Hassell engaged in disgraceful dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including through inappropriate provision of medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19; inappropriate management of patients in relation to COVID-19 treatment and prevention, including prescribing, and provision of inaccurate and/or misleading information to patients in relation to COVID-19.
It is also alleged that in 2021 and 2022, Dr. Hassell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to his communications on websites and other digital platforms regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues, including by making misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19.

It is further alleged that Dr. Hassell failed to comply with an interim Order made under s. 25.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, contravened terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration and failed to respond appropriately to written inquiries of the College, including requests from a College invest for information, including transcriptions of patient charts.
 
It is also alleged that in 2022, Dr. Hassell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by providing and/or offering to provide medical services to patients outside of the jurisdiction in which he is registered.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)