THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:25:35 AM
Hassell, Christopher Hilton
CPSO#:
30937
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2022
Summary:
On November 15, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Hassell failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College, in relation to his:- provision of COVID-19 vaccine exemptions;
- management of patients in relation to COVID-19 treatment and prevention, including inappropriate prescribing;
- communication of inaccurate and/or misleading information in relation to COVID-19;
- failure to comply with an Interim Order;
- failure to cooperate with the College’s investigation; and
- offering of services outside of Ontario without registration.
The Tribunal also found that Dr. Hassell is incompetent.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Hassell attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. Dr. Hassell pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by December 15, 2022.
Dr. Hassell also entered into an undertaking in which he agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, effective immediately.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-11-15
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 15, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 2, 2022, Dr. Hassell was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hassell resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada. Once these allegations have been determined by the Discipline Committee, the decision will be available to the public on the Public Register.
Dr. Hassell was also the subject of an open investigation regarding his standard of practice and conduct. In exchange for this undertaking, the College is taking no further action on the investigation.