skip to content

Handley, David George

CPSO#: 22001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr Marina Beshay B12-411 Bayfield St Barrie ON L4M 6G5
Date Received: 28 May 2019


Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Suite 302 125 Bell Farm Road Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 21 Dec 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David George Handley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Handley engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. During the investigation, Dr. Handley resigned from the College and has agreed to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)