THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:15:53 PM
Handley, David George
CPSO#:
22001
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr Marina Beshay
B12-411 Bayfield St
Barrie ON L4M 6G5
Date Received: 28 May 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Suite 302
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 21 Dec 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David George Handley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 25, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Handley engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. During the investigation, Dr. Handley resigned from the College and has agreed to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)