skip to content

Handa, Pooja

CPSO#: 97711

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Holland Court
P.O.Box 1209
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A7
Phone: (905) 775-8782
Fax: (905) 775-9290 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Kayla crescent
unit 8
Vaughan ON  L6A 4W3
Canada
Fax: 647-495-3643
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pooja Handa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Handa ( CPSO# 97711 )

Business Address:
P.O. Box 1209
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A7
Phone Number: (905) 775-8782


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Nov 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013 Active
             Dr. Pooja Handa may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.