THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 8:28:07 AM
Handa, Pooja
CPSO#:
97711
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Holland Court
P.O.Box 1209
Bradford ON L3Z 2A7
Phone: (905) 775-8782
Fax: (905) 775-9290
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Pooja Handa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jun 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Nov 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2013 |
|
Active |