First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2021 |