THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:51:12 AM
Hamour, Faisal Awad
CPSO#:
78912
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Suite 605
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 356-4499
Fax: (905) 356-4493
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:02 Nov 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAISAL AWAD HAMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMOUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 31 Mar 2003 to 28 Apr 2003
PEAP - R - General Surgery
McMaster University, 29 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 01 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 02 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2021 |