skip to content

Hammett, John David

CPSO#: 21998

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Hammett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 45 Wolsley Street Kenora, ON P9N 3W7
Date Received: 04 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John David Hammett to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 19, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Hammett's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Hammett was required to undergo a specified continuing education and remediation program. In lieu of completing the reassessment portion of the program, Dr. Hammett agreed to only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hammett shall practice only at Lake of the Woods District Hospital.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Download Full Document (PDF)