THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:43:50 AM
Hammett, John David
CPSO#:
21998
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Hammett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:45 Wolsley Street
Kenora, ON P9N 3W7
Date Received: 04 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John David Hammett to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 19, 2018:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Hammett's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Hammett was required to undergo a specified continuing education and remediation program. In lieu of completing the reassessment portion of the program, Dr. Hammett agreed to only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hammett shall practice only at Lake of the Woods District Hospital.
Download Full Document (PDF)