Halvorsen, Melanie Ann (CPSO#: 100103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone: (807) 274-3287
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. M. Kowal ( CPSO# 100791)
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. C. Botsford ( CPSO# 109944)
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. L. Keffer ( CPSO# 111231)
Dr. J. Burley ( CPSO# 109503)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708


Corporation Name: Halvorsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7741

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ANN HALVORSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALVORSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013