skip to content

Halliday, William Carroll

CPSO#: 33108

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1905
1 Palace Pier Court
Toronto
M8V 3W9
Toronto ON  M8V 3W9
Phone: (416) 253-7527 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.C. Halliday Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Halliday ( CPSO# 33108 )

Business Address:
Suite 1905
1 Palace Pier Court
Toronto ON  M8V 3W9
Phone Number: (416) 253-7527

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 02 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019