THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:13:12 AM
Halliday, William Carroll
CPSO#:
33108
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W.C. Halliday Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:02 Dec 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |