skip to content

Hall, Michael Clement

CPSO#: 17253

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2005
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2005

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Michael Clement Hall undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following:
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any
jurisdiction.