THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:15:15 AM
Hall, Michael Clement
CPSO#:
17253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:28 Dec 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1959 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 May 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1969 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Michael Clement Hall undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following:
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any
jurisdiction.