skip to content

Hajy Aghaei, Roya

CPSO#: 87642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Finch Medical Centre
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-9955
Fax: (416) 222-8088 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roya Hajy Aghaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hajy Aghaei ( CPSO# 87642 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-9955

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROYA HAJY AGHAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJY AGHAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010