THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:04:52 PM
Hajy Aghaei, Roya
CPSO#:
87642
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Finch Medical Centre
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
Willowdale ON M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-9955
Fax: (416) 222-8088
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROYA HAJY AGHAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJY AGHAEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |