skip to content

Ha, Edward Quoc Viet

CPSO#: 97255

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute Unit 29 1910 St. Laurent Boulevard Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 13 Feb 2012 to 25 Feb 2012
EL - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2012 to 10 Mar 2012
EL - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2016