THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:24:19 PM
Ha, Edward Quoc Viet
CPSO#:
97255
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
Unit 29
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 13 Feb 2012 to 25 Feb 2012
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2012 to 10 Mar 2012
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2016 |