skip to content

Gagne, Helene Manon

CPSO#: 74755

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 725-1870
Fax: (613) 725-1647 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Gagne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gagne ( CPSO# 74755 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
110 - 152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 725-1870


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELENE MANON GAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005