skip to content

Guntley-Lorimer, Edith Mae

CPSO#: 31157

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Jamaican Creole

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Guntley-Lorimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 16, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Guntley-Lorimer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.