THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:37:05 PM
Guntley-Lorimer, Edith Mae
CPSO#:
31157
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Jamaican Creole
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Guntley-Lorimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: July 16, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Guntley-Lorimer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.