skip to content

Gunasingam, Padumanithi

CPSO#: 94519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 carrie street
Strathroy General hospital
Strathroy ON  N6G 3J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-1550
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PADUMANITHI GUNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020