THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:56:24 AM
Gunasingam, Padumanithi
CPSO#:
94519
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: University of Colombo, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London
London ON N6G 0P5
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PADUMANITHI GUNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASINGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |