skip to content

Gulati, Meena

CPSO#: 89898

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 ANGELINE STREET
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Meena Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gulati ( CPSO# 89898 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5076

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6111


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010 Active
             Dr. Meena Gulati may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry, only.