THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:13:43 PM
Gulati, Meena
CPSO#:
89898
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Meena Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 May 2022 |