skip to content

Greene, Mitchell Dale

CPSO#: 20763

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2005

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Mitchell Dale Greene undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following,
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective
October 1, 2005, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jurisdiction.