THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:19:05 AM
Greene, Mitchell Dale
CPSO#:
20763
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Mitchell Dale Greene undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following,
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective
October 1, 2005, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jurisdiction.