skip to content

Gray, Christopher John George

CPSO#: 87955

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009