THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:58:56 PM
Gray, Christopher John George
CPSO#:
87955
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |