skip to content

Goscimski, Jacqueline

CPSO#: 93909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Goscimski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goscimski ( CPSO# 93909 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: 9054942120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GOSCIMSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSCIMSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011