THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:00:32 AM
Goscimski, Jacqueline
CPSO#:
93909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GOSCIMSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSCIMSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |