skip to content

Goode, Laura Colleen

CPSO#: 86771

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216E-2115 Finch Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: 416-740-1832
Fax: 416-747-3799 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:20 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA COLLEEN GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012