THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:23:42 AM
Goode, Laura Colleen
CPSO#:
86771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
216E-2115 Finch Ave. W.
Toronto ON M3N 2V6
Phone: 416-740-1832
Fax: 416-747-3799
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Laura Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:20 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA COLLEEN GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |